HI SCR216 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR216
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 956). |
2022-05-09 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 956). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 05-05-22. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-26-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 916). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 792). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2146-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3). |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2102-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan, Yamane, Okimoto. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 42 |
2022-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3538) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR216 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HWN/HOU/WTL.
HCR34 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
SR209 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR34 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
SR209 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.