HI SR196 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Construction Industry To Increase The Recycling Of Construction And Demolition Debris And To Expand The Usage Of Recycled Construction Materials To The Greatest Extent Possible.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Construction Industry To Increase The Recycling Of Construction And Demolition Debris And To Expand The Usage Of Recycled Construction Materials To The Greatest Extent Possible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3441) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR220 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24