HI SR17 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The United States Navy To Eradicate Octocoral And Other Invasive Species From Pearl Harbor.
Title
Encouraging The United States Navy To Eradicate Octocoral And Other Invasive Species From Pearl Harbor.
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-24. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3407) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR27 (Same As) 2024-04-22 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 759).