HI SR166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR166
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii And University Of Hawaii Professional Assembly To Convene A Task Force To Examine And Assess The University's: (1) Tenure System For Researchers And Other Non-instructional Faculty; And (2) Compensation Structure Of Faculty Engaged In Activities Supported By Extramural Funding And Grants; In Comparison To Peer Higher Education Institutions Across The United States, And Propose The Best Practices To Be Implemented By The University.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii And University Of Hawaii Professional Assembly To Convene A Task Force To Examine And Assess The University's: (1) Tenure System For Researchers And Other Non-instructional Faculty; And (2) Compensation Structure Of Faculty Engaged In Activities Supported By Extramural Funding And Grants; In Comparison To Peer Higher Education Institutions Across The United States, And Propose The Best Practices To Be Implemented By The University.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR166 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR201 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR201 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Academic Tenure
Best Practices
Report
Researchers and Other Non-Instructional Faculty
Task Force
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Professional Assembly
Best Practices
Report
Researchers and Other Non-Instructional Faculty
Task Force
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Professional Assembly