HI SCR201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR201
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii And University Of Hawaii Professional Assembly To Convene A Task Force To Examine And Assess The University Of Hawaii Tenure System For Researchers And Other Non-instructional Faculty, And Compensation Structure Of Faculty Engaged In Activities Supported By Extramural Funding And Grants, In Comparison To Peer Higher Education Institutions Across The United States; And Propose The Best Practices To Be Implemented By The University Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii And University Of Hawaii Professional Assembly To Convene A Task Force To Examine And Assess The University Of Hawaii Tenure System For Researchers And Other Non-instructional Faculty, And Compensation Structure Of Faculty Engaged In Activities Supported By Extramural Funding And Grants, In Comparison To Peer Higher Education Institutions Across The United States; And Propose The Best Practices To Be Implemented By The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-26 | House | Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 856). |
2021-04-26 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 856). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-23-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-23-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 602). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1897), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-15-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1771) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-07-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR201 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR166 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR166 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Academic Tenure
Best Practices
Report
Researchers and Other Non-Instructional Faculty
Task Force
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Professional Assembly
Best Practices
Report
Researchers and Other Non-Instructional Faculty
Task Force
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Professional Assembly