HI SR124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR124
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Sustainability Coordinator To Work With The State And County Film Offices To Develop Protocols To Ensure That Film And Television Productions In Hawaii Are Utilizing Sustainable Practices.
Title
Urging The State Sustainability Coordinator To Work With The State And County Film Offices To Develop Protocols To Ensure That Film And Television Productions In Hawaii Are Utilizing Sustainable Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3794) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR124 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to WTL/AEN.
SCR140 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SCR140 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Film and Television Productions
Single Use Plastic Alternatives
State and County Film Offices
State Sustainability Coordinator
Sustainable Practices
Single Use Plastic Alternatives
State and County Film Offices
State Sustainability Coordinator
Sustainable Practices