HI SCR85 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct An Audit Relating To Geothermal Resources.
Title
Geothermal Royalties; Attorney General Investigation
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1743), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chong, Ito; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Herkes, Riviere. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-21-11 9:35AM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 62 | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to EEP, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) One Day Notice 04-15-11. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Waived referral to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from WLH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH/JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Offered. |