HI SCR82 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging All Hawaii High Schools To Provide Hawaiian Language Classes.
Title
Hawaiian Language; Public High Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, referred to EDU. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022), with recommendation of referral to EDU. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ryan, Hee, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, English, Kahele. | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 04-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Referred to HWN, EDU. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=82 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR82_.HTM |