HI SCR48 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress To Support Federal Legislation Prohibiting Health Insurers From Denying Coverage To Victims Of Domestic Violence On The Grounds That It Is A Pre-existing Condition.
Title
Health Insurers; Domestic Violence as Pre-existing Condition
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1739), recommending referral to CPC. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Mizuno, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Jordan, C. Lee, Ching. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Belatti, C. Lee, Ching. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 04-14-11 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 55 | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 399). | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) One Day Notice 04-06-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=48 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR48_.HTM |