HI SCR44 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging Further Implementation Of Housing First Programs And Services To Combat Chronic Homelessness.
Title
Housing First; Homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 685). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) One Day Notice 04-28-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Deferred until 04-26-11. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 669). | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Jordan, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Pine, Thielen. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, referral sheet 62 | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-20-11 11:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 616) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from HMS/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kim, Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to HMS/WAM. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Offered. |