HI SCR195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Amend The United States Code To Permit All Retired, Disabled Veterans To Receive Concurrent Retirement And Disability Payments.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Amend The United States Code To Permit All Retired, Disabled Veterans To Receive Concurrent Retirement And Disability Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 04-07-21 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1458) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR195 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR160 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR160 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Concurrent Disability and Retirement Payments
Disabled Veterans
Retired Veterans
United States Congress
Veterans Affairs
Disabled Veterans
Retired Veterans
United States Congress
Veterans Affairs