HI SCR195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Title
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2069-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 636). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3685) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR195 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR167 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SR188 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC.
HCR167 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4).
SR188 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to JDC.