HI SCR185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR185
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Title
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 778). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2152-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2065-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tam, Kapela, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-13-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 701) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3724) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR185 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR158 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR178 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR158 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR178 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.