HI SR178 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Title
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3725) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-30-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR178 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
HR158 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SCR185 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR158 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
SCR185 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.