HI SCR185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR185
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Centennial Celebration Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Of 1920, As Amended.
Title
Recognizing The Centennial Celebration Of The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act Of 1920, As Amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Tokioka. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 04-05-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 562) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR185 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SR150 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR150 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.