HI SCR160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR160
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Landscape Management Plan With Goals To Increase Tree Canopies On Public School Grounds, Document Existing Inventory And Talent, And Identify Additional Resources Required To Implement And Sustain The Plan.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Landscape Management Plan With Goals To Increase Tree Canopies On Public School Grounds, Document Existing Inventory And Talent, And Identify Additional Resources Required To Implement And Sustain The Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR160 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR68 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR125 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR68 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR125 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.