HI HCR68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR68
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Landscape Management Plan With Goals To Increase Tree Canopies On Public School Grounds, Document Existing Inventory And Talent, And Identify Additional Resources Required To Implement And Sustain The Plan.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Create A Landscape Management Plan With Goals To Increase Tree Canopies On Public School Grounds, Document Existing Inventory And Talent, And Identify Additional Resources Required To Implement And Sustain The Plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1715), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 348). |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2021-03-05 | House | Offered |
2021-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR68 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR56 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR56 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.