HI SCR157 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Senate To Ratify The United Nations Convention On The Rights Of Persons With Disabilities.
Title
United Nations Convention on the Rights of Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported from HMS/TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS/TIA/PSM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=157&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR157_.HTM |