HI SCR155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to JUD, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (H) Referred to JUD, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Study On The Feasibility Of Implementing A Powerball State Lottery, Mega Millions Lottery, Or Both, In The State.
Title
Lottery Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to JUD, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 635) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 2). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, English, Ihara, Slom). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1295) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Chun Oakland, Slom; and 4 Excused: English, Espero, Kim, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-13-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-11 9:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |