HI SCR154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - Referred to OMH, HLT, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - Referred to OMH, HLT, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Develop And Implement Administrative Rules And Policies To Facilitate And Encourage Traditional Hawaiian Burials.
Title
Traditional Hawaiian Burials; Department of Health; Rules and Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to OMH, HLT, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 468) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1356) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HTH. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |