HI SCR151 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of A Work Group To Examine Social Determinants Of Health And Risk Adjustment For Medicaid, Gap-group, And Uninsured Individuals.
Title
Social Determinants Work Group; Health and Risk Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1147), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:05PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=151&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR151_.HTM |