HI SCR145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education And The Department Of Education To Collaborate With Parent Organizations To Develop Statewide Policies For Family Engagement For Hawaii's Public Schools.
Title
Board of Education; Department of Education; Family Engagement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 707). | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll, Nishimoto, Pine excused. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 05-03-11. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 69 | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Nishimoto, Pine excused. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Chang, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Saiki. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-25-11 1:45PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 4-25-11 at 1:45 PM. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 54 | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 396). | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) One Day Notice 04-05-11. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1043) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to EDU. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=145 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SCR145_.HTM |