HI SCR122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Deferred one day 05-02-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Deferred one day 05-02-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Implement A Schedule Of Reduced Irrigation Water Toll Rates And Charges For The Island Of Hawaii And Hamakua District That Differentiates Among Different Irrigation System Areas And Agricultural Users To Promote The Development And Expansion Of Hawaii-grown Agricultural Commodities Through Increased Use Of Irrigation Water.
Title
Hawaii Island Irrigation Water Rates; Water Toll Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-13. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from AGL/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=122&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR122_.HTM |