HI SCR111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Convene A Task Force To Study And Identify Appropriate Stockpile Storage Facility Options To Store And Distribute Emergency Supplies In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Convene A Task Force To Study And Identify Appropriate Stockpile Storage Facility Options To Store And Distribute Emergency Supplies In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 04-06-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR111 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR88 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR88 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.