HI SCR111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR111
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Certify Good Standing For All Lessees Of State Public Lands And Prohibit The State From Leasing Or Renewing The Lease Of Any Public Lands To Any Individual, Corporation, Or Public Agency That Has Not Met All Financial, Contractual, And Legal Obligations.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Certify Good Standing For All Lessees Of State Public Lands And Prohibit The State From Leasing Or Renewing The Lease Of Any Public Lands To Any Individual, Corporation, Or Public Agency That Has Not Met All Financial, Contractual, And Legal Obligations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR111 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR169 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR98 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
HCR169 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 27
SR98 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=111&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SCR111_.HTM |