HI SCR111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Continue Its Research Of The Timebanking Concept For Hawaii's Respite System.
Title
Executive Office on Aging; Timebanking
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=111&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR111_.HTM |