HI SCR111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Regulation Of Large-scale Dog Breeders And Dog Breeding Facilities.
Title
Sunrise Review; Auditor; DCCA; Large-Scale Dog Breeders
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 700). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Deferred one day 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Pine. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 04-28-11 9:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, referral sheet 64 | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to ERB, LMG, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 626) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kim. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-13-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1019), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green, Slom. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |