HI SB95 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB95
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain amounts of child support moneys collected by the Department of Human Services for public assistance of a child to pass through to the family receiving public assistance. Requires the Department of Human Services to disregard passed-through child support payments when calculating the income of an applicant for or recipient of public assistance. Increases the maximum fine for an employer who discharges from employment, refuses to employ, or takes disciplinary action against a noncustodial parent subject to income withholding or who fails to comply with an order of assignment of future income to pay child support. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Child Support.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HHS/JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB95 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Child Support
Department of Human Services
Employer
Fines
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program
Child Support
Department of Human Services
Employer
Fines
Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=95&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB95_.HTM |