HI SB940 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes religious facilities from the definition of "place of public accommodation" to exempt those facilities from the law regarding discrimination in public accommodations.
Title
Public Accommodations; Religious Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1337 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=940&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB940_.HTM |