HI SB935 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Aerospace Development in the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation instead of the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. Repeals references to the Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems. Transfers the rights, powers, functions, and duties of the Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems to the Office of Aerospace Development. Allows the Aerospace Advisory Committee to select the Director of the Office of Aerospace Development. Reduces the number of members on the Aerospace Advisory Committee. Appropriates funds to UH. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Aerospace.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Luke Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1860) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Belatti. |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-12-21 11:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB935 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Subjects
Appropriation
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer
University of Hawaii
Office of Aerospace Development
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems
Transfer
University of Hawaii