HI SB815 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB815
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes maintenance of effort provisions for free education. Establishes a public education stabilization trust fund. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education Funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 286) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB815 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HB611 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB611 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).