HI SB815 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB815

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes maintenance of effort provisions for free education. Establishes a public education stabilization trust fund. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education Funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-23HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2021-03-23HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 286) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-17SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:05PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB611 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB815 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback