HI SB773 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB773
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a class 18 small craft producer pub licensee to manufacture not more than 75,000 barrels of malt beverages on the licensee's premises during the license year. Clarifies that a class 14 brewpub licensee or class 18 small craft producer pub licensee may conduct certain activities at satellite locations other than the licensee's primary manufacturing premises under certain conditions. Clarifies the definition of "growler". Allows direct shipment of all forms of liquor, rather than just wine, by certain licensees. (SB773 HD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1371) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB773 (Carry Over) 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
HB546 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
HB546 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).