HI SB717 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB717
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of Hawaiian home lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records and make the digital database available for use no later than 7/1/2022. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 95) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB717 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB545 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB545 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).