HI HB545 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of Hawaiian home lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records and create a usable digital database no later than 7/1/2022. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-03HouseThe committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB717 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback