HI SB717 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB717
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members in planned community associations subject to HRS 421J and unit owners in condominiums subject to HRS 514B to register units leased as transient accommodations. Requires associations to submit annual reports to county planning departments and Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism (DBEDT). Requires DBEDT to submit annual reports to the Legislature.
Title
Related To Transient Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB717 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HB29 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB29 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Association
Condominium
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Planned Community Association
Registration
Report
Transient Accommodations
Condominium
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Planned Community Association
Registration
Report
Transient Accommodations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=717&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB717_.HTM |