HI SB717 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 161, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 161, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals existing requirement that gasoline for motor vehicles be composed of ten per cent ethanol. Effective December 31, 2015. (CD1)
Title
Ethanol; Motor Vehicles; Energy Efficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 161, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 161, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Nakashima. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 11:10AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-15 11:10AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-27 | House | Re-referred to EEP, TRN, CPC, referral sheet 55 |
2015-04-27 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Aquino, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-04-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP, TRN, referral sheet 45 |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Yamane. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Galuteria. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB743 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to EEP, TRN, CPC, referral sheet 2