HI SB620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses to certify whether a person is totally disabled under the income tax code. Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses to make capacity determinations. Adds advanced practice registered nurses as primary providers in advance mental health care directives. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Advanced Practice Registered Nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:00AM; 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Carry Over) 2021-03-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB302 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
HB302 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
Subjects
Advanced Mental Health Directives
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Disability
Income Tax Code
Mental Capacity Determinations
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Disability
Income Tax Code
Mental Capacity Determinations