HI SB619 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions concerning fitness to proceed examinations in criminal proceedings to specify circumstances in which qualified advanced practice registered nurses or advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority who hold an accredited national certification in an advanced practice registered nurse psychiatric specialization may participate. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Advanced Practice Registered Nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 495) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Misalucha, San Buenaventura, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:00AM; 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB303 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB619 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB619 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22