HI HB303 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB303

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions concerning fitness to proceed examinations in criminal proceedings to include qualified advanced practice registered nurses or advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority who hold an accredited national certification in an advanced practice registered nurse psychiatric specialization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Advanced Practice Registered Nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB619 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB303 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback