HI HB303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions concerning fitness to proceed examinations in criminal proceedings to include qualified advanced practice registered nurses or advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority who hold an accredited national certification in an advanced practice registered nurse psychiatric specialization.
Title
Relating To Advanced Practice Registered Nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB303 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB619 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB619 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=303&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB303_.HTM |