HI SB587 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB587
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for violating provisions relating to the installation of noisy exhaust pipes and mufflers. Authorizes police officers to conduct examinations and inspections if the officer has probable cause to believe that a vehicle's excessively noisy muffler is evidence of a violation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Todd, Matsumoto. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 548). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Ganaden, Garcia, Gates, Hashem, Holt, Kapela, Kila, La Chica, Lamosao, Perruso, Poepoe, Souza voting no (14) and Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Holt, Kila, Lamosao, Poepoe, Souza voting no (7) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (4). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-03-24 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt, Souza; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Kong. |
2023-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Kim, Richards). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB587 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).