HI SB552 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB552
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes citizens to bring a nuisance abatement suit under chapter 712, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to enjoin and abate nuisances related to environmental hazards, including tobacco smoke that drifts into any residential unit a person rents, leases, or owns, from another residential or commercial unit.
Title
Relating To Nuisance Abatement.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB552 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=552&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB552_.HTM |