HI SB552 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HMS/PSM/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HMS/PSM/HWN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the county's power to issue affordable housing credits to DHHL for the development of vacant lots. Removes restriction that county requirements for affordable housing may not impair the county's obligation to apply the credits in full satisfaction of all county requirements.
Title
Affordable Housing; DHHL; Counties; Kauai County Package
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/PSM/HWN, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB227 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=552&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB552_.HTM |