HI SB515 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB515
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense, in coordination with the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency, Department of Health, and the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation, to identify and propose an appropriate location for the construction of a state stockpile storage facility to stockpile emergency supplies necessary for responding to natural disasters and pandemics. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To A State Stockpile Storage Facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB515 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=515&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB515_.HTM |