HI SB501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the coastal zone management program's objectives and policies. Amends the special management area law by: removing demolition of a structure from the definition of "development"; requiring that any future development on a subdivided lot takes into account the long-term impact of sea level rise; amending the definitions of "special management area emergency permit", "special management area minor permit", and "special management area use permit"; and prohibiting the approval of development unless adequate mitigation is required in areas subject to coastal hazards. By January 1, 2018, requires counties with available and reviewed shoreline erosion rate data to establish shoreline setbacks using a method prescribed by DLNR, which may be at least sixty feet inland from the shoreline. (SD1)
Title
Coastal Zone Management; Sea Level Rise Impacts; Shoreline Setbacks
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-19-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |