HI SB500 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB500
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes clean ground transportation goals for state agencies on a staggered basis until achieving a 100 per cent light-duty motor vehicle clean fleet by 12/31/2035, and all light-duty motor vehicles in the State by 12/31/2045. Requires the procurement policy for all agencies purchasing or leasing medium- and heavy-duty motor vehicles to seek vehicles that reduce dependence on petroleum-based fuels that meet the needs of the agency, where feasible and cost-effective. Requires state and county agencies to purchase building materials that reduce the carbon footprint of the project for use on the construction of new roads, where feasible and costeffective.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=500&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB500_.HTM |