HI SB492 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB492
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the conditions under which the definition of "enter or remain unlawfully" shall apply with reference to criminal trespass in the second degree. Amends the offense of criminal trespass in the second degree to repeal the definition of "reasonable warning or request" and clarify that a reasonable warning or request by an owner or lessee of the commercial premises, the owner's or lesee's authorized agency, or a police officer may be communicated in writing at any time within a one-year period inclusive of the date the incident occurred with certain exceptions. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Criminal Trespass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB492 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
HB304 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB304 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.