HI SB492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a means by which a minor may petition the family court for emancipation, and directs the court regarding investigation of the petition, appointing counsel and a guardian ad litem for the petitioner, and the findings necessary to grant the petition. Outlines the rights gained by the minor upon emancipation and authorizes the court to require the minor's parents or legal guardians to pay for court ordered services. (SD1)
Title
Emancipation of Minors; Children; Parents; Family Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HSH, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |