HI SB486 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB486

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts artisan-scale composting operations from department of health regulations to divert organic materials from Hawaii's landfills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Composting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee on AEN deferred the measure.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-02-02SenateRe-Referred to AEN, CPN.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN/HTH, CPN.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB486 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback